MD HB897 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain hospitals that provide certain care in a unit that is licensed as a limited private inpatient facility to authorize patients to seek insurance reimbursement for certain services, bill certain patients in a certain manner, and provide certain staff assistance; and requiring the Office of Health Care Quality, on or before December 31, 2019, to make a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Limited Private Inpatient Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback