MD HB898 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "manufacturing" to include handling or movement of a finished product at a manufacturing site before storage or shipping; and making specified personal property used for handling or movement of a finished product at a manufacturing site after the last step of production through the next immediate step before storage or shipping exempt from property tax.
Title
Personal Property Tax - Manufacturing Property - Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |