MD HB902 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified not-for-profit customers to transfer specified generation credits accrued from electricity produced from specified renewable sources to specified properties.
Title
Energy Companies - Net Energy Metering - Credit Transfers
Sponsors
Del. D Page Elmore [R] | Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. Sue Hecht [D] |
Del. Richard Impallaria [R] | Del. James King [R] | Del. Mary Love [D] | Del. Brian McHale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Re-assigned Economic Matters | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Energy Matters
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Energy Matters
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0902.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0902f.pdf |