MD HB902 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a provider in the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program to receive certain State funds under certain circumstances; and exempting providers in the Program from certain State requirements for eligible prekindergarten providers.
Title
Prekindergarten - Ulysses Currie Head Start Program - Eligibility for State Funds
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Mark Edelson [D] | Del. Kevin Harris [D] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] |
Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Del. Sarah Wolek [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-2) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |