MD HB903 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force on Green Chemistry; providing for the membership of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to designate the chair of the Task Force; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development to provide staff for the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to meet at least quarterly at specified times and places; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation and authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Title
Task Force on Green Chemistry
Sponsors
Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Emmett Burns [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] |
Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters Withdrawn | |
2011-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Industry and Technology
Reports
Sunset
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0903.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0903f.pdf |