MD HB905 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "eligible student" to provide that students who are enrolled directly in a registered apprenticeship program that partners with a public community college in the State are eligible for Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships.
Title
Education - Workforce Development Sequence Scholarships - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96 |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224738/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {654968/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB845 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |