MD HB917 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a police officer at a motor vehicle checkpoint from targeting only motorcycles for inspection or evaluation; creating a specified exception to the prohibition for a police officer at a motor vehicle checkpoint established as part of a police search or investigation; providing for the construction of a provision of law governing obedience to a lawful order or direction of a police officer; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Discrimination
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections