MD HB924 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authority of local jurisdictions to designate a portion of a highway for snowmobile use to facilitate access between trails by repealing the requirement that the snowmobile trails accessed be designated by the Department of Natural Resources; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Local Authority - Use of Highways by Snowmobiles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Counties
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Off-Road Vehicles
Sports and Recreation
Highways
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
Off-Road Vehicles
Sports and Recreation