MD HB933 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring chronic care hospitals to develop a financial assistance policy for free and reduced-cost care to patients; requiring a hospital financial assistance policy to provide reduced-cost medically necessary care to patients who have a financial hardship; requiring a hospital to apply a reduction that is most favorable to a patient; establishing requirements for continued eligibility for reduced-cost care due to a financial hardship; altering the requirements for a notice that a hospital must post; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance and Debt Collection
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Del. Sue Kullen [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Credit
Debt Collection
Foreclosure
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Judgments
Liens
Notices
Patients
Prices
Reports
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Credit
Debt Collection
Foreclosure
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Judgments
Liens
Notices
Patients
Prices
Reports