MD HB933 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an owner of residential real property in Baltimore City to request that real property tax notices be sent to a specified address; requiring Baltimore City to send a specified notice to an owner of real property after a specified request has been made; requiring the notice to the owner of real property to contain specified information; requiring Baltimore City to send real property tax notices in accordance with a specified request if no objections are raised by the owner of the real property; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax - Notice of Tax Bill Address Change - Prohibition of Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Fees
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Counties - Local Laws
Fees
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Property Tax
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property