MD HB939 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Advisory Council on the Impact of Regulations on Small Businesses in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Advisory Council to take specified actions and make specified determinations about proposed regulations; requiring the Maryland Economic Development and Business Climate Commission to examine whether the Advisory Council should consider whether a proposed regulation poses a potential unreasonable burden on consumers; etc.
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan01) {203920/4 Rejected (10-37) (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {883226/1 Rejected (10-37) (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan01) {203920/4 Rejected (10-37) (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {883226/1 Rejected (10-37) (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senators Pugh, Middleton, and Jennings |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-08 | House | Delegates Kramer, Fisher, and Davis |
2015-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-08 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2015-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {203920/4 Rejected (10-37) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {883226/1 Rejected (10-37) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senators Conway and McFadden) {473825/1 Adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {627773/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {627773/1 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2015-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693997/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
AELR Committee
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
AELR Committee
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Regulations and Procedures