MD HB939 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the hours during which a licensee may sell alcoholic beverages on Sundays in Frederick County.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Frederick County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Frederick County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1009.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 1009.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 20 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |