MD HB955 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using specified identifying information or the identity of an individual without consent to invite, encourage, or solicit another to commit a sexual crime against the individual; establishing penalties; authorizing a State's Attorney or the Attorney General to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act; providing that when the Attorney General exercises the authority to investigate and prosecute a violation of the Act, the Attorney General has specified powers and duties; etc.
Title
Crimes - Use of Personal Identifying Information or the Identity of Another - Sexual Crimes
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Del. Luiz Simmons [D] | Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorney General
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Grand Juries
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Fraud
Grand Juries
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys