MD HB970 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, for a development with 11 or more homes to be built by the same builder, a home builder to provide a purchaser with written information on energy-efficient options available for installation in a new home; and requiring a contract for the initial sale of a new home to contain a specified acknowledgment that the purchaser was provided with specified information about energy-efficient options for the home.
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-14) (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-14) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {150412/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Building Codes
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Tax Credits
Building Codes
Construction
Contracts
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Housing
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Tax Credits