MD HB977 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Somerset County to sell the property at Map 32, Parcel 149 on Revells Neck Road under terms considered appropriate by the county commissioners.
Title
Somerset County – Sale of Property – Revells Neck Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB763 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 12 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |