MD HB98 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB553
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the types of elements and units for which a council of unit owners is required to maintain certain property insurance and altering certain requirements for the property insurance policy; and requiring owners of detached units to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of the unit.
Title
Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {493127/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report {493127/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators West, James and Kelly) |
2023-04-07 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators West, James and Kelly) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2023-04-07 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Holmes, Lehman and Baker) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-07 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Holmes, Lehman and Baker) |
2023-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2023-04-05 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator West) Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113226/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423128/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2022-10-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB553 (Carry Over) 2022-02-02 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
SB403 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
SB403 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |