MD HB983 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Senate Refuses to Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified local critical area programs to, with a specified exception, prohibit the location of junkyards, scrap storage yards, and other scrap metal facilities in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area; etc.
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Prohibition - Junk and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 984038/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-02 | Delegates Frush, Niemann, and Norman | |
2012-04-02 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-04-02 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-04-02 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Counties
Environmental Matters
Storage
Wreckers and Scrap Processors
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Counties
Environmental Matters
Storage
Wreckers and Scrap Processors