MD HB983 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each county board of education to evaluate the emergency management plan in each public school under the jurisdiction of the county board on or before February 1, 2014; requiring each county board of education to report to the State Department of Education on a specified evaluation on or before March 1, 2014; requiring the Department to make a specified report to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Emergency Management Plans - Evaluations
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] |
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Schulz) Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {335463/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Sunset