MD HB991 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a food processing residuals utilization permit; prohibiting a person from utilizing food processing residuals in the State unless the person obtains a permit; requiring the Department of Agriculture to provide a certain notice and information to certain persons in a county where food processing residuals will be stored; establishing the Food Processing Residuals Administration Fund; authorizing a representative of the Department to enter and inspect any site where food processing residuals are utilized; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-17) |
2024-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263328/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-26) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323120/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1074 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Certifications
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Construction
County Councils
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Ethics
Examinations
Farmers and Farming
Farmland
Fees
Food
Forms
Health
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
internet
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Livestock
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
permits
plants
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Signatures
Soil Conservation
Standards and Best Practices
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Trees
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Certifications
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Construction
County Councils
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Ethics
Examinations
Farmers and Farming
Farmland
Fees
Food
Forms
Health
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
internet
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Livestock
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
permits
plants
Public Information
Publications
Real Property
Records
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Signatures
Soil Conservation
Standards and Best Practices
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Trees
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 8 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8 | 1103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 8-8A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |