MD HJ11 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that authorizes regulation of contributions and expenditures intended to influence elections.
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-42) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-42) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993427/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |