MD SB10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $500,000 to $750,000 the minimum gross income amount by which the registration statement of a charitable organization must include an audit by an independent certified public accountant; providing a range of $300,000 but less than $750,000 of gross income amounts by which the registration statement of a charitable organization must include a specified review; and increasing the gross income amount from $500,000 to $750,000 at which the Secretary of State may require an audit or review of a charitable organization.
Title
Business Regulation - Charitable Organizations - Audit and Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {388274/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |