MD SB1000 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class L beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for the county to issue the license to a holder of a manufacturer's license; authorizing the license holder to hold another license or permit issued by the Board; specifying that the license authorizes the license holder to sell or provide samples of certain beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; requiring the license holder to provide prepackaged snacks; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Boundaries
Fees
Food
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1000?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb1000f.pdf |