MD SB1004 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making inapplicable in Calvert County the prohibition against a holder of a Class B or Class C license from selling alcoholic beverages at a bar or counter on Sunday; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-6) (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-6) (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-6) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343395/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Calvert County
Emergency Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Calvert County
Emergency Bills