MD SB1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of a county to hold a public hearing before the transfer of an asset of the county as part of the development of a high-speed transportation system; requiring notice of the public hearing to be delivered by first-class mail to homeowners and businesses within 500 feet of the asset; requiring a supermajority vote for approval by certain county and municipal entities of a transfer of an asset of a county as part of the development of a high-speed transportation system; etc.
Title
Counties - Asset Transfer for High-Speed Transportation System - Hearing and Approval Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Counties - Generally
Hearings
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Public Information
Railroads
Real Property
Counties - Generally
Hearings
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Personal Property
Postal Service
Public Information
Railroads
Real Property