MD SB1006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the commission the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund is required to pay to a fund producer of a policyholder to whom a private passenger auto insurance policy is issued by the Fund; and requiring the Fund, on or before a specified date, to report to specified legislative committees on specified information concerning the implementation of a specified commission payment structure.
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Fund Producers - Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-04-02 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-30 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-03-26 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments 257774/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-17 | First Reading Senate Rules |