MD SB1014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to consult with each primary procurement unit to identify potential contracting opportunities for and increase outreach efforts to small businesses; requiring each unit, on or before June 30 each year, to submit to the Office a procurement forecast for all procurement contracts over $100,000; requiring each unit, on or before August 15 each year, to submit its reconciliation of the prior fiscal year's procurement forecast in accordance with certain requirements; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Procurement Forecast and Outreach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-9) |
2024-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173826/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {363422/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
internet
Minority Business Enterprises
Procurement
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
internet
Minority Business Enterprises
Procurement
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 304.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |