MD SB1031 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the basis for calculating a certain license fee credited to the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and the Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund; expanding, to include fiscal years 2020 and 2021, the purposes for which the Department of the Environment may use money in the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; etc.
Title
Environment - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund - Funding, Reallocation, and Reimbursements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accidents
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Heating and Cooling
Licenses
Pollution
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Emergencies
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Heating and Cooling
Licenses
Pollution
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes