MD SB1040 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying specified standards for involuntary admissions of individuals with mental disorders to specified facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for emergency evaluations of individuals with mental disorders under specified circumstances; modifying specified standards for clinical review panel approval; establishing the Task Force on the Delivery of Services to Individuals with Mental Illness; etc.
Title
Mental Hygiene - Reform of Laws and Delivery of Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {187471/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Emergencies
Examinations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Mental Health
Minors
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Review Boards
State Hospitals
Sunset
Veterans
Disabilities
Emergencies
Examinations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Mental Health
Minors
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Review Boards
State Hospitals
Sunset
Veterans