MD SB1043 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the juvenile court to conduct a hearing to review the status of a child placed in a qualified residential treatment program and make a certain determination within a certain period of time after the child enters the placement; requiring the juvenile court to review a certain assessment and consider certain factors at a certain hearing; requiring the juvenile court to state, in writing, the reasons for its decision to approve or disapprove the continued placement of a child in a qualified residential program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-04-03HouseHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-03HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback