MD SB1043 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain new units to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget $57,700,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB1043 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
HB1260 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB1260 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Appropriations
Budgets
Curriculum
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interest
Investments
Minorities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 126 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 15 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1043?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1043f.pdf |