MD SB1055 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local department of social services to maintain specified reports of suspected abuse or neglect and all assessments and investigative findings for specified periods of time for the purpose of determining whether a pattern exists; and increasing the time period after which a local department is required to expunge specified reports and records of suspected child abuse and neglect.
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |