MD SB1068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Study the Regulation of Payroll Services; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make specified recommendations on or before December 15, 2013, regarding the payroll services industry in the State; etc.
Title
Commission to Study the Regulation of Payroll Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-1) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587972/2 Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Glassman) Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Glassman) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fraud
Licenses
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Sunset
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fraud
Licenses
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Sunset