MD SB1079 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified conditions under which the Board of License Commissioners of Washington County may issue a specified alcoholic beverages license to the owner of a hotel or motel; requiring the hotel or motel to have specified lobby facilities, to have a ballroom, conference room, or banquet room instead of specified dining facilities; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at retail at the place described under the license for on-premises consumption; etc.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Washington County