MD SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing references to the term "qualified distressed county" and substituting references to the term "Tier I county" in certain provisions of law relating to the Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund, the Maryland Industrial Development Financing Authority, and a grant for the administration of the Preliminary Scholastic Aptitude Test; altering the definition of "distressed county" for purposes of the Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distressed Counties - References and Definitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {615060/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-10-15SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0011&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0011f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0011t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0011e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_82_sb0011e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0011_61506001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0011.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0011_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0807.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0011_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1398.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1517.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback