MD SB119 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying a provision authorizing a certain purchase of eligibility service credit in the Employees' Pension System for certain employment; providing that certain members of the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System who meet certain criteria may continue employment with certain participating employers of the State Retirement and Pension System without incurring a certain break in service following retirement from the Employees' or Teachers' Pension System; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees’ and Teachers’ Pension Systems – Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {474263/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-07SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-01-29SenateHearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-01-17SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0119&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0119f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0119t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0119e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_484_sb0119e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0119_47426301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0119.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0119_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0183.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0119_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1129.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1139.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/ag_letters/sb0119.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback