MD SB122 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB94
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $7,000 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {373621/1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1472 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1472 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |