MD SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services, for students committed to its custody, to notify a local superintendent of schools or school principal of a student's reportable offense or offense related to the student's membership in a criminal gang; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations to ensure that certain information is used to provide appropriate educational programming and services for the social, emotional, and academic development of the student and to maintain a safe and secure school environment; etc.
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {758572/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-11-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Arrests
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, State Board of
Gangs
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
State's Attorneys
Students
Subpoenas
Teachers
Youth
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education, State Board of
Gangs
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
School Administration
State's Attorneys
Students
Subpoenas
Teachers
Youth