MD SB144 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a unit in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to allow specified holders of occupational and professional licenses to renew an expired license without penalty under specified circumstances and to complete continuing education or competency requirements within a reasonable time after license renewal.
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Occupational and Professional
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/2 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Education
Fees
Fines
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Militia
Registration
Education
Fees
Fines
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Militia
Registration