MD SB144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding an attorney representing a patient to the list of individuals to whom a health care provider is prohibited from charging a fee for providing copies of a medical record that will be used for the purpose of filing a claim regarding or appealing a denial of Social Security disability income or Social Security benefits.
Title
Medical Records - Fees - Attorneys Representing Patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-08-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |