MD SB146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding interests in specified mutual funds from the interests in corporations, partnerships, and limited liability partnerships and companies that must be disclosed on an annual financial disclosure statement under the Maryland Public Ethics Law.
Title
Public Ethics - Financial Disclosure Statements - Mutual Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-17 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2012-02-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-15 | Favorable with Amendments 334831/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |