MD SB153 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restructuring State government by the consolidation of the Department of the Environment into the Department of Natural Resources; abolishing the Department of the Environment by June 30, 2012; abolishing the positions of Secretary of the Environment and Deputy Secretary of the Environment by July 1, 2012; transferring all of the functions, powers, duties, equipment, assets, and liabilities of the Department of the Environment to the Department of Natural Resources; etc.
Title
Reorganization of State Government - Consolidating the Department of the
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Noise
Pollution
Privatization
Radiation
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sanitarians
Sewage
State Employees
Wells
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Bonds
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Noise
Pollution
Privatization
Radiation
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sanitarians
Sewage
State Employees
Wells
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0153.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0153f.pdf |