MD SB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Codifying a requirement that a county pay its share of 50% of the State's costs to acquire and operate the uniform statewide voting systems; requiring that a county's share of the cost of acquiring and operating the uniform statewide voting system be based on the county's voting age population; and requiring that, in both the 2022 statewide primary election and the 2022 statewide general election, in-person voting on election day be conducted at a certain number of precinct polling places.
Title
Election Law - Voting Systems Costs and Polling Places - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 35 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | Floor Amendment {913623/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443720/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {983925/1 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Communications
Contracts
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Contracts
Counties
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Election Law | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |