MD SB158 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law that exempts the use of a facility by a cannabis licensee from certain county or municipal zoning requirements if the facility is used by a grower, processor, or dispensary that held a certain Stage One Preapproval for a license before October 1, 2022, and was not operational before October 1, 2022.
Title
Cannabis Licensing - Zoning Requirements - Alteration
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 36 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0158?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0158f.pdf |