MD SB164 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Advisory Committee on the Naming of State Facilities, Roads, and Bridges and other related provisions of law.
Title
Advisory Committee on the Naming of State Facilities, Roads, and Bridges -
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-02-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |