MD SB167 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending termination provisions and altering dates of applicability for specified tax credits for employers that hire qualifying individuals with disabilities.
Title
Tax Credits for Qualifying Employees with Disabilities - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments 265163/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-22 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-10 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-10 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-20 | Hearing 2/1 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |