MD SB171 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adding gas and electric utility services to the types of services for which landlords of buildings that contain six or more units are required to provide a written notice to a tenant, at the initiation of a lease and each term thereafter, providing the total utility costs billed to the landlord in the immediately preceding year for utility services, disaggregated by utility type; and applying certain requirements relating to payment of utility services to landlords of buildings that contain five or fewer residential dwelling units.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Notice of Utility Bills in Residential Leases - Gas and Electric Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-35) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653921/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {973227/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB139 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Subjects
Fines
Forms
Human Services, Department of
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Forms
Human Services, Department of
Landlords and Tenants
Leases and Rent
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |