MD SB172 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing an obsolete reference to the J. DeWeese Carter Center in a provision relating to certain facilities operated by the Department of Juvenile Services.
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/13 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 9 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |