MD SB175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a fiduciary institution to disclose certain financial records from a specified period of time that are requested in writing by an adult protective services program that is investigating suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; authorizing an adult protective services agency or a law enforcement agency to share certain information with a fiduciary institution that made a report of suspected financial abuse or financial exploitation; etc.
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393226/1 Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disclosure
Elder Abuse and Neglect
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Fiduciaries
Investigations and Inquiries
Records
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Elder Abuse and Neglect
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Fiduciaries
Investigations and Inquiries
Records
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Financial Institutions | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 14 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 14 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |