MD SB176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations that provide for an announced inspection by the Department of each registered family day care home prior to issuance of a continuing registration; repealing a requirement that the Department inspect on an announced basis family day care homes and child care centers at least once every 2 years; etc.
Title
Family Law - Family Day Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Child Care
Education, State Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Inspections
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Education, State Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Inspections
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations