MD SB179 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to 30 years the maximum duration of an energy performance contract by a unit of State government.
Title
Energy Performance Contracts – Duration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Contracts
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Works, Board of
State Government - Procurement
Time
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Works, Board of
State Government - Procurement
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |